Financial history WM BROOKE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 209138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £153.26k £112.97k £175.47k £197.00k £266.98k
Total expenditure £183.44k £151.82k £125.62k £214.20k £138.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.42k £731 N/A N/A