Friends of Vellore UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Christian Medical College (CMC), Vellore, Tamil Nadu, India and hospitals working in partnership with CMC Vellore. Friends of Vellore UK seek to help CMC to ensure that everyone can receive appropriate medical treatment regardless of their ability to pay. We raise funds to support healthcare, education and development projects that benefit the poorest and most excluded communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 October 1962: Standard registration
- 29 April 2015: Funds received from 283659 BISHOPSTON KUPPAM LINK
- FRIENDS OF VELLORE (IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dayalan Clarke | Chair | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anitha Johnson Samuel | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Patrick Skeil | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Das | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Benjamin Pulimood | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHNSON THAMARATHU SAMUEL | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Richard Rajamanickam BA | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LADY DR ARABELLA ONSLOW | Trustee | 05 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Robert Burch Keighley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
The Very Revd Dr Isaac Munuswamy Poobalan RGN BD MTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.03k | £263.36k | £712.42k | £333.77k | £357.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.77k | £255.53k | £441.08k | £332.28k | £415.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.76m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £64.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £306.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £433.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £7.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £5.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £407.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £3.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18/04/1952 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/1954 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/1960 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/1962 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/1963 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/1971 AS AMENDED ON 27/11/1972 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 02 APR 2016 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 03 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT CHRISTIAN MEDICAL EDUCATION IN INDIA BY ENLISTING AND MAINTAINING INTEREST IN THE SAID CHRISTIAN MEDICAL COLLEGE AND HOSPITAL, VELLORE OR, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE BOARD, ANY OTHER INSTITUTION OF LIKE CHARACTER. TO ASSIST CMCH VELLORE OR SUCH OTHER INSTITUTIONS IN MAINTAINING THEIR CHRISTIAN CHARACTER AND PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS THROUGH PRAYER, PERSONNEL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A CHALK LANE
COCKFOSTERS
BARNET
EN4 9JQ
- Phone:
- 03333445245
- Email:
- office@friendsofvellore.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window