FRIENDS OF HAMMERSMITH HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are entirely self supporting. Our income comes from membership fees,donations, legacies and proceeds from our gift shop and flower shop.We aim to meet requests for funding received from Hammersmith Hospital, that may not be readily available through the NHS.Our aim is to supply equipment beneficial to patients and staff and to provide facilities for the treatment of patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 26 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS A SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jon Westall | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harjinder Grewal | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SWEID | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mae Taylor Pavlik | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN PEARL OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.12k | £173.86k | £94.90k | £75.76k | £121.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.38k | £92.02k | £70.26k | £111.36k | £101.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NO TRACE OF C.C. SCHEME.RULES ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER, 1950.
Charitable objects
AMENITIES FOR PATIENTS OF HAMMERSMITH HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Hammersmith Hospital
HAMMERSMITH HOSPITAL
150 DU CANE ROAD
LONDON
W12 0HS
- Phone:
- 0208743 3496
- Email:
- imperial.friendhh@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window