BARCLAY'S AND STANDON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 209195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides almshouses and grants for people in need from the Ancient Parish of Standon, Herts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £85,692
Total expenditure: £90,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 18 December 2008: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 18 December 2008: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Mansfield Chair 04 July 2023
None on record
Hayley Saul Trustee 13 May 2025
None on record
Christopher Leage Trustee 27 November 2024
None on record
Jody Gray Trustee 04 July 2023
HERTS AND ESSEX BORDER RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Andrew Mansfield Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Rev John Chitham Trustee 29 May 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, STANDON
Received: On time
MARK ACFORD Trustee 12 June 2007
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.94k £77.25k £82.87k £75.05k £85.69k
Total expenditure £12.44k £26.53k £49.98k £97.79k £90.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10TH APRIL 1894 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 7TH AUGUST 1953, 16TH APRIL 1963 AND 11TH NOVEMBER 1971.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF STANDON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HSRDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF STANDON
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 18 December 2008 : Removed
  • 18 December 2008 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
26 Fishers Close
Puckeridge
Hertfordshire
SG11 1TD
Phone:
07850025938