ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL FOR THE CLERGY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide charitable healthcare to members of the Anglican Clergy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 1962: Standard registration
- 11 January 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 January 2011: Funds transferred to 1123195 ST LUKE'S HEALTHCARE FOR THE CLERGY
- ST LUKE'S NURSING HOME FOR THE CLERGY (FORMERLY HOSTEL OF ST LUKE) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.66m | £1.89m | £3.34m | £2.38m | £410.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60m | £3.66m | £3.55m | £3.92m | £2.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.55m | £575.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £286.81k | £1.55m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £2.57k | £100 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £255.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £540.65k | £294.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.58m | £3.14m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £104.65k | £350.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.52m | £11.27k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 10 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 23 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 09 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 26 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 28 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 10 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 12 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 18TH MAY 1918. CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4TH MAY 1949, 17TH MAY 1977, 15TH MAY 1981, 18 SEPT 2007, AND 18 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENT AND A HOSPITAL FOR ANGLICAN (A) CLERGY OF THE COMMUNION AND OF THOSE CHURCHES IN FULL COMMUNION WITH IT, THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, DEPENDANT CHILDREN AND OTHER RELATIVES AS APPROVED BY THE EXECUTIVE OR HOUSE COMMITTEE. (B) THEOLOGICAL STUDENTS WHO HAVE BEEN ACCEPTED AS CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS BY A BISHOP OF THE COMMUNION. (C) ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE ORDER OF DEACONESSES. (D) MISSIONARIES. (E) WHOLE TIME LAY CHURCH WORKERS LICENSED BY A BISHOP. (F) MEMBERS OF RECOGNISED MONASTIC AND CONVENTIONAL ORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window