Adelphi Genetics Forum

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learned Society. Membership organisation. Education. Medical/health/sickness. Relief of poverty. Overseas aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 1995: Standard registration
- EUGENICS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE GALTON INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Nicholas Wood PhD FRCO | Chair | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Wynn PhD | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Ralph Levison PhD | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anneke Lucassen DPhil FRCP | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shirley Hodgson BSc,BM,DM | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Panagiotis Sergouniotis FRCOphth | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Burghel | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Helen Rosemary Middleton-Price PhD | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dian Donnai CBE,FRCP | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosemary Ekong MSc PhD | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Veronica van Heyningen CBE DPhil | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicholas Mascie-Taylor MA PhD ScD | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gregory Radick MPhil, PhD | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Read MA PhD | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Johnston BSc | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELENA BOCHUKOVA BSC, DPhil | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.45k | £113.44k | £120.32k | £131.18k | £133.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.14k | £43.65k | £106.96k | £106.85k | £98.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 1926 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 SEP 2021 INCORPORATED 20 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE FORUM ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY:- 3.1.1 FACILITATING SCHOLARLY AND PUBLIC DISCUSSION OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE SCIENCE OF HUMAN GENETICS; 3.1.2 FACILITATING WELL INFORMED TEACHING ON THE SCIENCE OF HUMAN GENETICS; AND 3.1.3 PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCE OF HUMAN GENETICS AND DISSEMINATING USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 11 October 1995 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 NORTHFIELDS PROSPECT
NORTHFIELDS
LONDON
SW18 1PE
- Phone:
- 02088747257
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window