VARIETY THE CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) promote and provide for the care and upbringing of sick, disabled and disadvantaged children within the UK (2) advancement of education and the relief of financial need of children within the UK (3) provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation for children in the interests of their social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life for such children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,546,756
Donations and legacies | £4.49m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £965.54k | |
Investments | £95.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,898,442
Raising funds | £1.93m | |
Charitable activities | £3.97m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.93m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.97m |
People

20 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 July 1962: Standard registration
- VARIETY CLUB (Working name)
- THE HEART OF VARIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE VARIETY CLUB CHILDREN'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE VARIETY CLUB CHILDREN'S CHARITY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Louise Davis KC | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gordon Geddes | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Bryer | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Talya Shalson | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Candice Sammeroff | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Whittle | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Remond | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tesula Mohindra | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dilaram Kitchlew-Williamson | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tushar Prabhu | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JONATHAN SHALIT OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.66m | £3.67m | £3.69m | £5.38m | £5.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.41m | £3.82m | £3.66m | £4.90m | £5.90m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.38m | £3.18m | £2.65m | £4.09m | £4.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.18m | £386.34k | £945.53k | £1.17m | £965.54k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £99.54k | £102.02k | £92.07k | £118.53k | £95.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £70.94k | £347.87k | £59.16k | £100.91k | £89.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.54m | £2.34m | £2.19m | £3.01m | £3.97m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.87m | £1.49m | £1.47m | £1.89m | £1.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £168.45k | £256.13k | £172.87k | £159.92k | £109.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £615.67k | £1.45m | £1.32m | £2.03m | £2.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.72m | £1.68m | £1.65m | £1.66m | £1.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.74m | £1.62m | £1.69m | £1.61m | £1.61m | |
|
Other assets | £2.22m | £2.13m | £2.41m | £2.66m | £3.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.71m | £1.73m | £1.95m | £1.74m | £2.59m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/1952 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2017 as amended on 27 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF SICK, DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 3. TO UNDERTAKE AND TO ASSIST OTHERS TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO ANY ILLNESS OR AFFLICTION AFFECTING CHILDREN WHICH WILL ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
VARIETY
THE CHILDREN'S CHARITY
VARIETY HOUSE
93 BAYHAM STREET
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02074288100
- Email:
- info@variety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window