Register of Charities - The Charity Commission LYME GREEN SETTLEMENT
Charity number: 1155679-1
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 12/06/1946
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/03/1979
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/09/1997
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/07/2003
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/04/2005
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 MAR 2018
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PARAPLEGIA AND/OR SEVERE DISABILITY, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Registration history
- 02 October 1963: Standard registration
- 23 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1155679 LYME GREEN SETTLEMENT CIO
Other names
- LYME GREEN SETTLEMENT FOR PARAPLEGICS (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.