CHARITY OF MABEL ASPREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK,CONVALESCENT,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND WHO ARE EITHER RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF ST. AGNES KENNINGTON PARK OR ARE MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH .PROVIDED THAT INCOME SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES,TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS BUT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 July 1965: Standard registration
- THE MABEL ASPREY TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
john wrighton | Chair | 16 November 1997 |
|
|
||||
William Williams | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Daboh | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SUSAN VERA JACKSON | Trustee | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON ACLAND | Trustee | 05 March 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £1.13k | £1.31k | £1.36k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £810 | £700 | £600 | £800 | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 2ND NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. AGNES.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. AGNES, KENNINGTON PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 ST. AGNES PLACE
LONDON
SE11 4BB
- Phone:
- 02078208050
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window