Trustees BOVEY TRACEY PARISH CHURCH CHARITY
Charity Number: 209300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MIDGLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Chesterman | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
His Honour Francis Gilbert QC | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WINCKLES | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rowland Dell | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL HOSFORD | Trustee | 09 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev GRAHAM HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.