THE FRANK PARKINSON YORKSHIRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The chief activities of the charity are the provision of relief and assistance to old, sick and/or poor persons living in Yorkshire, particularly in the parish of Guiseley, and the provision of almshouses for old people in the parish of Guiseley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FPYT Trustees Limited | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.40k | £335.17k | £344.44k | £354.98k | £396.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.54k | £300.08k | £427.00k | £416.02k | £368.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCT 1950 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POOR, AGED AND SICK OF YORKSHIRE IN PARTICULAR THE PARISH OF GUISELEY; PROVISION OF HOSPITAL ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAME, ALMSHOUSES FOR OLD OF GUISELEY. 2. SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES ETC FOR STUDENTS BOUND FOR THE ELECTRICAL INDUSTRY, GENERAL ASSISTANCE OF NECESSITOUS CASES AND CONVALESCENT HOMES FOR THOSE EMPLOYED IN THE ELECTRICAL INDUSTRY. 3. GRANTS TO ANY CHARITIES FURTHERING THOSE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GUISELEY AND NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
No 26 Frank Parkinson Court Office
Bingley Lands
Guiseley
Leeds
LS20 9EY
- Phone:
- 01943 871655
- Email:
- info@fpyt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window