CHARITY OF SARAH, DUCHESS OF MARLBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide housing accomodation for those over 60 years of age and in need in the area of St Albans in Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ALLISON FRANCES WREN | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Sellers | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jacqlyn Ann Taylor | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GOODRIDGE | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN ROSEMARY HARRIS | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|||||
UNA DUNLEAVY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.97k | £186.47k | £234.78k | £235.83k | £250.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.14k | £91.98k | £148.43k | £125.31k | £127.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF CHANCERY OF 3RD JUNE 1867. SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 2ND SEPTEMBER 1955
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES AND STIPENDS FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER OVER THE AGE OF 60.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Marlborough Buildings
Hatfield Road
ST. ALBANS
AL1 3RW
- Phone:
- 01727869254
- Email:
- admin@csdom.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window