Register of Charities - The Charity Commission WILLOUGHBY MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 247900-5
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 MARCH 1961, 2 OCTOBER 1961, 22 OCTOBER 1965 AND 18 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT IN CASES OF NEED OF NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS AND MEN OF THE 9TH/12TH ROYAL LANCERS (PRINCE OF WALES'.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 May 1966: Standard registration
- 04 December 1991: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.