FRIENDS OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Brighton & Hove Hospitals work to provide innovative new equipment as well as patient comforts in hospitals and community healthcare facilities across the City.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS (BRIGHTON, HOVE AND NEWHAVEN) (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS (BRIGHTON, HOVE AND NEWHAVEN) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Rendel | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee-ann Pert | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Lucy Hurt | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosanne Louise McColl | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muna al-Jawad | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edward Griffiths | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Eric Austin | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Deborah Patricia REEDER | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE CHURCH | Trustee | 06 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD KIDD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.72k | £148.31k | £61.00k | £69.23k | £290.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455.23k | £159.66k | £135.63k | £159.66k | £59.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2015 as amended on 24 Jun 2019 as amended on 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE BRIGHTON HOVE AND NEWHAVEN GROUP BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (FOR OTHER OBJECTS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 ST. GEORGES ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN2 1ED
- Phone:
- 01273664936
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window