HILTON TOWN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS IN HILTON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 August 1962: Standard registration
- THE TOWN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID BUSK | Chair | 08 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Joanne Helen Turner | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Margaret Broom | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Lynn | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rachel Ann Lawton | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85k | £5.00k | £5.43k | £6.08k | £6.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £5.82k | £3.48k | £5.00k | £3.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 27TH FEB., 1698-9 IN P.R. VOL.24 P.104 AND ORDER UNDER L.G. ACT, 17TH JANUARY, 1899 AS AMENDED ON 5 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HILTON, AND THEIR HEIRS.
Area of benefit
HILTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Sparrow Way
Hilton
HUNTINGDON
PE28 9NZ
- Phone:
- 01480830866
- Email:
- phil.n.wood@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window