THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF INTERNATIONAL AND COMPARATIVE LAW

Charity number: 209425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote by means of study groups, meetings and conferences the study and development of international law and comparative law (including foreign law). To promote or commission research into international law and comparative law (including foreign law) and to publish or arrange for publication or otherwise disseminate the results of that research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Belgium
  • Burma
  • France
  • Germany
  • India
  • Italy
  • Jordan
  • Malaysia
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Poland
  • Qatar
  • South Africa
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Gregory Trustee 11 December 2024
DERBY QUAD LIMITED
Received: On time
Audley William Sheppard KC Trustee 11 December 2024
THE FRIENDS OF VICTORIA UNIVERSITY OF WELLINGTON
Received: On time
Ndanga Kamau Trustee 11 December 2024
None on record
Katherine Louise Jones Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Eve Coulter Salomon CBE Trustee 01 July 2023
THE BATH PRESERVATION TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Chiann Bao Trustee 05 December 2021
None on record
HABIB MOTANI Trustee 20 September 2021
THE AGA KHAN UNIVERSITY (INTERNATIONAL) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE OF ISMAILI STUDIES
Received: On time
Professor Elies van Sliedregt Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Professor Iain Gerard MacNeil Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Shehzad Charania Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Alexander David Just Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Guy Gibson Beringer Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Dean Simon Curtis Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Dr Sorcha MacLeod Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Caroline Perks Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Rupert Hugh Skilbeck Trustee 16 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.86m £4.00m £4.01m £4.07m £5.63m
Total expenditure £2.83m £3.34m £4.18m £4.05m £5.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.29k N/A £1.57m £113.71k £188.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £629.67k £570.89k £349.69k £354.04k £316.88k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.17m £3.39m £3.63m £3.68m £5.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.45k £19.45k £21.76k £24.02k £35.03k
Income - Other £37.12k £19.63k £12.34k £10.69k £15.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.59m £3.11m £3.89m £3.88m £5.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £231.91k £222.25k £285.77k £173.60k £188.01k
Expenditure - Governance £13.80k £14.15k £13.32k £11.82k £14.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £407.82k £644.44k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.39m £1.62m £1.49m £1.38m £2.09m
Long-term investments £949.56k £997.28k £1.12m £979.34k £0
Other assets £1.35m £2.26m £2.44m £2.18m £3.77m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.74m £2.22m £2.45m £1.99m £3.22m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRITISH INSTITUTE OF INTERNATIONAL
& COMPARATIVE
CHARLES CLORE HOUSE
17 RUSSELL SQUARE
LONDON
WC1B 5JP
Phone:
02078625151