THE FRANCIS BACON SOCIETY INCORPORATED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society has been established to encourage for the benefit of the public, the study of the works of Sir Francis Bacon, his character and his life, to encourage the general study of the evidence in favour of Sir Francis Bacon's authorship of the plays commonly ascribed to Shakespeare and to investigate his connection with other works of the Elizabethan period.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathon Freeman | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Keegan | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edi Bilimoria | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA HELEN EZEN | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £5.51k | £4.79k | £5.48k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £12.71k | £9.72k | £12.47k | £16.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM DATED 20 AUGUST 1903 AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 JUNE 1950 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11 MARCH 1952, 11 MARCH 1953, 9 JANUARY 1963 AND 28 MAY 1965 AND 14TH JULY 1999. as amended on 15 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE STUDY OF THE WORKS OF FRANCIS BACON AS PHILOSOPHER, LAWYER, STATESMEN AND POET; ALSO HIS CHARACTER, GENIUS AND LIFE; HIS INFLUENCE ON HIS OWN AND SUCCEEDING TIMES, AND THE TENDENCIES AND RESULTS OF HIS WRITINGS. (2) TO ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE GENERAL STUDY OF THE EVIDENCE IN FAVOUR OF FRANCIS BACON'S AUTHORSHIP OF THE PLAYS COMMONLY ASCRIBED TO SHAKESPEARE AND TO INVESTIGATE HIS CONNECTION WITH OTHER WORKS OF THE ELIZABETHAN PERIOD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 19 September 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07818602302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window