AGE ENDEAVOUR FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- South Africa
Governance
- 21 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR EDWARD DATNOW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gerald Edward Kidd | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MAYER | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW SIMON DATNOW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.53k | £6.70k | £7.34k | £8.77k | £11.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.22k | £7.10k | £12.77k | £14.11k | £19.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH JULY 1948 AS AMENDED 19TH MAY 1980 AND 15TH SEPTEMBER 1981 23 JULY 1998 AND 2 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR DISTRESS OF THE ELDERLY AND TO PURSUE ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER, MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND TO BE CONCERNED WITH UNEMPLOYMENT OF THE ELDERLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
130 HOLLAND PARK AVENUE
LONDON
W11 4UE
- Phone:
- 07879633903
- Email:
- ROBERTDATNOW@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window