Accounts and annual returns JOHN RUSSELL CHARITY FOR POOR

Charity number: 209519
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 03 March 2009 489 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 03 March 2009 854 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted