THE RON HANCOCK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No donations were made during this year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 July 1962: Standard registration
- THE PHILIP HANCOCK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Francis Thompson | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Christina Thompson | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500.00k | £0 | £169.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £95.00k | £6.15k | £24.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2024 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2024 | 762 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 March 2024 | 1127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 March 2024 | 1127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/05/1954 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 DRAX AVENUE
LONDON
SW20 0EY
- Phone:
- 07802287568
- Email:
- sue.thompson@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window