East Sussex Vision Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING LOCAL PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED, AND THEIR CARERS, TO RETAIN OR REGAIN INDEPENDENCE BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, SKILLS TRAINING AND BY PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION, ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £102,155 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- EAST SUSSEX ASSOCIATION OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- THE EAST SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie O'Brian | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Rosemary Shepherd | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Bowers | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian George Fletcher-Price | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Gillett | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLLR Chris Dowling | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHNSTON | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|||||
GAVIN LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.59k | £414.83k | £409.08k | £508.90k | £374.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £408.03k | £283.58k | £402.73k | £495.44k | £488.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £104.45k | £159.52k | £39.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.30k | £104.45k | N/A | £48.85k | £102.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £237.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £246.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £710 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £162.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £469.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.33k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £89.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JULY 1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 DECEMBER 1989, 29 MARCH 2000, 10 NOVEMBER 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2009. as amended on 22 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE (PHYSICAL AND GENERAL) WELFARE OF THE BLIND, AND THE PREVENTION OF BLINDNESS, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THE BLIND ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE. THE WORD BLIND THROUGHOUT THESE PRESENTS SHALL INCLUDE ANY PERSON WHO IS BLIND, OR SUFFERING FROM ANY COMPLAINT OF THE EYES, OR COMES WITHIN THE DEFINITION OF A BLIND PERSON UNDER THE BLIND PERSONS ACT.
Area of benefit
ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE.
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Vicarage Field
Hailsham
Bn27 1BD
- Phone:
- 01323832252
- Email:
- info@eastsussexblind.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window