SALTERTON DRAMA CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the advancement and improvement of general education in relation to all aspects of the arts of drama, music and other such arts and the development of public appreciation and interest in such arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 06 December 1963: Standard registration
- BUDLEIGH SALTERTON DRAMA CLUB (Previous name)
- SALTERTON THEATRE AND ARTS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Dawn Hill | Chair | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Travis | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Turner | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Alsford | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Christopher Steedman | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Barry Rogers | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Nicholls | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Elvy | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jeffery Gomm | Trustee | 31 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Judith Stewart-Young | Trustee | 01 June 1987 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.47k | £10.61k | £22.45k | £15.93k | £31.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.15k | £8.54k | £26.30k | £24.03k | £17.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 20TH MAY 1970 AS REVISED ON 24TH MAY 1972 AMENDED 25TH JULY 1977, FURTHER AMENDED 19 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATIONTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND INTEREST IN SUCH ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 REDHILLS
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON
EX9 6JW
- Phone:
- 01395442197
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window