ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 209580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We have a clinic for those on benefits in the Folkestone and Hythe area. This clinic is based at Havelock House, 180 Dover Road, Folkestone, Kent. It operates three times a week. We also support neutering and microchipping in the area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,631
Total expenditure: £84,014

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA Folkestone (Working name)
  • RSPCA KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Hicks Chair 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Alexander Page Trustee 25 July 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Olena Shpylova Trustee 25 July 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rebecca Odd Trustee 13 June 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Siobhan Pery-Knox-Gore Trustee 22 June 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Maddison Broom Trustee 22 June 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dr Sian Elisabeth Hughes Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Pamela Ninham Trustee 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Jeff Hicks Trustee 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.73k £35.00k £71.13k £54.64k £33.63k
Total expenditure £80.30k £75.00k £62.65k £29.97k £84.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RSPCA Kent-Folkestone& District
Henwood House
Henwood
ASHFORD
Kent
TN24 8DH
Phone:
07936911613