Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 209580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Hicks Chair 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Alexander Page Trustee 25 July 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Olena Shpylova Trustee 25 July 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rebecca Odd Trustee 13 June 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Siobhan Pery-Knox-Gore Trustee 22 June 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Maddison Broom Trustee 22 June 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dr Sian Elisabeth Hughes Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Pamela Ninham Trustee 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Jeff Hicks Trustee 07 June 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered