ANGLICAN PACIFIST FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Study and application of the Christian Gospel in its relation to war, by holding conferences and engaging with the Anglican Communion and others by peaceful means. Publish a journal and other literature promoting peacemaking. Re-design our website and The Anglican Peacemaker,to set up a Facebook page, a blog and have an advertising campaign.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Canada
- India
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Switzerland
- Uganda
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 November 1962: Standard registration
- A P F (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE ANN DEMPSEY CLAYDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Simon Ramacci | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable David Owen Selzer | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Damilola Williams | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cloud Mabaudi | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Smith | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Willow Northeald | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bernard Dagnall | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vincent Jonathan Hartfield | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Benvie | Trustee | 21 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nathaniel Pierce | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY KEMPSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE GILMURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.74k | £16.75k | £9.31k | £8.83k | £10.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.51k | £41.99k | £35.83k | £37.61k | £28.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SOCIETY FOUNDED IN 1937 BY CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 2006, 20 OCTOBER 2007 AND 17 JANUARY 2009, AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 OCTOBER 2005 AND AMENDED ON 24 OCTOBER 2015. as amended on 27 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIANITY, ESPECIALLY BY THE STUDY AND APPLICATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN RELATION TO MODERN WAR AND ALLIED SOCIAL EVILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Short Street
SWANSEA
West Glamorgan
SA1 6YG
- Phone:
- 07494272595
- Website:
-
anglicanpeacemaker.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window