CRANBROOK AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly distributions to beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 09 July 1996: Removed
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard David King | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Penelope Durie | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANITA ROLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £1.10k | £852 | £857 | £886 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19k | £1.49k | £1.76k | £1.60k | £795 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME OF 11 JANUARY 1957 AND AS AMENDED OR AFFECTED BY RESLOUTIONS PASSED UNDER S.74(2)(C) AND S.75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 ON 15 JANUARY 1996 as amended on 01 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE SICK POOR OF THE PARISH OF CRANBROOK GENERALLY OR OF SUCH SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THEY SELECT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF CRANBROOK
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 09 July 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Badgers Mews
Dr Hopes Road
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN17 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01580715940
- Email:
- ceupton@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window