G T LITTLEFAIR TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maximise total return from investments with medium risk and lowest costs, and distribute income to needy ex employees of Marathon Knitwear, needy people of Nottinghamshire and registered charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN GORDON MALCOLM LITTLEFAIR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES FRANCIS LITTLEFAIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.69k | £5.69k | £4.12k | £4.40k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.37k | £5.37k | £5.49k | £5.11k | £4.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
5TH JUNE, 1950 TRUST DEED.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE EMPLOYEES OF JOHN BEALES ASSOCIATED COMPANIES AND THEREAFTER ANY NECESSITOUS PERSON RESIDENT IN THE CITY OR COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM.
Area of benefit
CITY OR COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
JASMINE COTTAGE
LODGE LANE
SCREVETON
NOTTINGHAM
NG13 8JN
- Phone:
- 07973343007
- Email:
- Ian@littlefair.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window