Financial history THE COULTHURST TRUST

Charity number: 209690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £37.60k £26.61k £21.94k £23.38k £21.00k
Total expenditure £39.76k £43.78k £96.70k £28.35k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A