Governing document BRIGHTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 209698
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 1940 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1950, 01 JUNE 1951 25 JUNE 1957, 01 NOVEMBER 1973 AND 12 OCTOBER 1977 4TH JULY 1990 22ND MARCH 1994 14TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED, AND DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE BRIGHTON, HOVE, AND OTHER AREAS OF SUSSEX IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR SHALL HEREAFTER BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRIGHTON & HOVE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.