Governing document THE BOARD OF GUARDIANS AND TRUSTEES FOR THE RELIEF OF THE JEWISH POOR REGISTERED (COMMONLY CALLED THE JEWISH WELFARE BOARD)
Charity number: 209723
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAWS OF THE BOARD ADOPTED ON 29 MARCH 1967 CONFIRMED 5 APRIL 1967 AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1967, 18 MARCH 1992 AND SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND TO AMELIORATE THE CONDITION OF THE JEWISH POOR OF THE METROPOLIS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.