HOLLAND'S GIFT CHARITY

Charity number: 209761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide finance for secretary and sexton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £41
Total expenditure: £838

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 26 April 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLLAND'S GIFT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martin Eric Percival Chair 04 October 2022
None on record
Ann Dorothy Foster Trustee 31 March 2014
ELIZABETH AND DOROTHY ROUS CHARITY
Received: On time
VICTOR ERIC WARNE Trustee
ELIZABETH AND DOROTHY ROUS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £49 £49 £49 £42 £41
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £838
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 October 2024 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 MILL ROAD
BADINGHAM
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 8LG
Phone:
01728638357
Website:

No information available