ROYAL ALFRED SEAFARERS' SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of care home facilities and housing for retired and disabled seafarers, their widows and dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,157,375
Donations and legacies | £347.15k | |
Charitable activities | £2.70m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £106.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,679,044
Raising funds | £79.23k | |
Charitable activities | £4.60m | |
Other | £0 |
£175,643 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £79.23k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.60m |
People

92 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 02 July 1992: Removed
- ROYAL ALFRED (Working name)
- ROYAL ALFRED SEAFARERS (Working name)
- ROYAL ALFRED SOCIETY (Working name)
- ROYAL ALFRED SEAFARER'S SOCIETY (Previous name)
- ROYAL ALFRED'S MERCHANT SEAMEN'S SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cedric Philip Wake OBE FNI | Chair | 30 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr Alison Lewis-Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Captain Stephen CLINCH | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD WATSON | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|||||
COMMANDER SUSAN E LOCHNER JP DL | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN ADRIAN McCOURT | Trustee | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PARKER | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Ross-Tomlin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOCTOR RICHARD REUBIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.06m | £3.76m | £3.42m | £3.04m | £3.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04m | £3.92m | £3.87m | £4.08m | £4.68m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £305.58k | £662.70k | £441.98k | £619.82k | £347.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.38m | £2.84m | £2.76m | £2.25m | £2.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £373.98k | £259.49k | £217.78k | £175.03k | £106.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £117.65k | £310.00k | £98.23k | £261.02k | £26.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.96m | £3.80m | £3.76m | £4.00m | £4.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £84.80k | £118.32k | £115.91k | £88.26k | £79.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.03k | £24.78k | £27.12k | £26.70k | £32.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £53.95k | £40.91k | £54.01k | £39.31k | £14.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.77m | £4.88m | £6.85m | £9.49m | £12.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.57m | £9.67m | £7.72m | £5.63m | £1.63m | |
|
Other assets | £1.04m | £2.07m | £2.59m | £415.83k | £444.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £285.04k | £385.63k | £238.89k | £258.90k | £302.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 11/05/1977 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 10/03/1982 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 27/05/2014
Charitable objects
(A)PROVIDE, CARRY ON AND MAINTAIN HOMES OR HOUSING FOR THE CARE OF AGED, INFIRM, DISABLED OR DISADVANTAGED SEAFARERS WHO CAN PROVE SERVICE IN BRITISH OR COMMONWEALTH VESSELS SATISFACTORY TO THE SOCIETY, AND TO THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDENTS AND ANY OTHER PREMISES AND ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH MAY BE CONNECTED THEREWITH; (B)PROVIDE OTHER RELIEF INCLUDING MEDICAL CARE TO SEAFARERS OF ALL AGES AND TO THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO MAY BE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE; (C)ACT AS TRUSTEE OR ALMONER FOR GRANTING RELIEF TO SEAFARERS OF ALL AGES AND IN NEED, AND TO THE WIDOWS AND DEPENDENTS OF ANY SUCH SEAFARERS OUT OF THE FUNDS OF THE SOCIETY, AND TO ANY OTHER RELEVANT BODY CORPORATE, UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION OR INDIVIDUALS; AND (D)PROMOTE AND CONCERN ITSELF WITH CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF SEAFARERS AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDENTS. WHERE ‘SEAFARER’ SHALL BE DEEMED TO INCLUDE ALSO EMPLOYEES OF SHIPPING COMPANIES, SHIP REPAIRERS, DOCK AREAS AND PORT AUTHORITIES, WORKERS IN CONNECTION WITH OFFSHORE PLATFORMS OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS, AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE SOCIETY, HAVE HAD CONNECTION WITH THE SEA OR THE SHIPPING INDUSTRY DURING THEIR WORKING LIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 02 July 1992 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Weston Acres
Woodmansterne Lane
Banstead
SM7 3HA
- Phone:
- 07749380338
- Email:
- enquiries@royalalfred.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window