THE TOGETHER TRUST

Charity number: 209782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Together Trust provides care, education and support for children, young people, adults and families in need in England and Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 04 May 2007: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE TOGETHER TRUST (Working name)
  • TOGETHER TRUST (Working name)
  • BOYS' AND GIRLS' WELFARE SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • TOGETHER TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILES GADDUM Chair 14 February 2019
BEECH HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Steven Pitt Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Rebekah Pierre Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Michael Henshaw Trustee 10 December 2022
None on record
Marcell Edwards Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Jane Walapu Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Geoffrey Durbin Trustee 14 December 2021
None on record
Ganiatu Martins Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Jane Grime Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Norah Flood Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
Ian Barry Johnson Trustee 14 February 2019
None on record
ROGER ANTHONY HORNE Trustee 14 February 2019
THE JOSEPH AND ANN SLATER MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE BINGHAM TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Farnworth Trustee 14 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.82m £30.70m £32.57m £33.75m £38.51m
Total expenditure £28.69m £29.30m £31.20m £34.07m £39.57m
Income from government contracts £27.71m £29.03m £31.30m £31.18m £36.21m
Income from government grants £89.63k £265.46k £97.29k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £239.00k £194.00k £237.00k £231.00k £294.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £29.54m £30.46m £32.28m £33.38m £38.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.00k £21.00k £24.00k £146.00k £116.00k
Income - Other £14.00k £25.00k £29.00k £1.00k £8.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.48m £29.10m £31.02m £33.84m £39.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £211.00k £198.00k £176.00k £226.00k £284.00k
Expenditure - Governance £241.00k £260.00k £269.00k £254.00k £287.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £2.51k £5.65k £6.65k £8.35k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £18.51m £18.29m £18.17m £18.10m £18.38m
Long-term investments £262.00k £302.00k £976.00k £924.00k £999.00k
Other assets £12.64m £14.29m £12.88m £12.52m £12.06m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 -£312.00k -£724.00k
Total liabilities £5.83m £5.79m £3.48m £3.23m £4.26m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 APRIL 1956.
Charitable objects
TOWARDS THE REPAIR MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE BETHESDA HOME FOR CRIPPLED CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SALFORD.
Registration history
  • 05 March 1963 : Standard registration
  • 04 May 2007 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
THE TOGETHER TRUST
THE TOGETHER TRUST CENTRE
SCHOOLS HILL
CHEADLE
SK8 1JE
Phone:
01612834848