FREESTON AND SAGAR'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses Charity providing social housing for those in need in the area of benefice. Suitable for the elderly or those with mobility needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
- THOMAS WARD (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN DREW THALER | Chair | 12 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
RYSZARD TOSTA | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Louise Tinniswood | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev ALAN MURRAY | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Susan Elaine Blezard | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN BRENNAN | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £24.64k | £23.94k | £72.89k | £70.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £38.39k | £38.39k | £225.02k | £200.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2022 | 503 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2021 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 MAY 1987
Charitable objects
(I) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS IN NEED IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE TOWN OF NORMANTON, THE PARISHES OF SHARLSTON AND WARMFIELD-CUM-HEATH AND THE AREA OF THE FORMER PARISH OF ACTON AND SYNDALE ALL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE. (II) SUBJECT TO (1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Home Farm Court
Bretton
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF4 4TR
- Phone:
- 07486568188
- Email:
- johnbrearton22@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window