THE BEXHILL SENIOR CITIZENS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide social, educational and physical activities for senior citizens and a safe, comfortable place where members can meet with other like-minded people in the local area, relieve isolation and loneliness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nee | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Patricia Jarrad | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Brenda Eldridge | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Nee | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Rose Mills | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.12k | £32.27k | £80.33k | £39.99k | £53.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.11k | £13.94k | £53.80k | £42.27k | £60.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.88k | £20.24k | £11.57k | £7.24k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 15TH AUGUST 1960, AS AMENDED 19TH MAY 1995 AND 29TH MAY 1998. as amended on 28 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION FOR SENIOR CITIZENS LIVING IN BEXHILL AND SURROUNDING AREAS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
BEXHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 EVERSLEY RD
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
EAST SUSSEX
TN40 1HA
- Phone:
- 01424212911
- Email:
- bexhillscc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window