Financial history THE DRAPERS' ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 209850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.56m £1.38m £1.48m £1.28m £1.49m
Total expenditure £927.09k £1.20m £938.79k £1.23m £2.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.10m £1.09m £988.31k £1.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £357.93k £284.00k £385.75k £293.48k £443.89k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £927.09k £1.20m £938.79k £1.23m £2.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.50k £18.83k £14.02k £17.27k £19.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0