THE MITCHELL AND DARLING BUNGALOWS

Charity Number: 209907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of living accommodation in the form of almshouses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 02 May 2024

Total income: £10,045
Total expenditure: £3,131

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR D S GORE Trustee
None on record
ANITA JOY MCLEOD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/05/2020 02/05/2021 02/05/2022 02/05/2023 02/05/2024
Total gross income £11.06k £10.58k £12.26k £11.21k £10.05k
Total expenditure £1.99k £12.65k £2.65k £6.98k £3.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 May 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2023 18 February 2025 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2020 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dudley Gore & Co
50 Queen Street
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT11 9EE
Phone:
01843594651
Website:

No information available