Financial history GELDESTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 209939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.25k £14.17k £43.93k £11.76k £21.47k
Total expenditure £5.34k £12.00k £14.38k £15.03k £16.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k £2.67k N/A N/A