Accounts and annual returns RICHARD PIKE OR PUKES

Charity number: 209954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 16 December 2024 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 16 December 2024 684 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 02 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 02 February 2022 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required