Financial history CANTERBURY AND ROCHESTER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID

Charity number: 209971
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 30/06/2011
Total gross income £50.61k £32.65k £33.27k £35.32k £52.73k
Total expenditure £44.36k £39.81k £36.09k £34.19k £18.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A