Governing document THE ARMY CATERING CORPS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED MARCH 1966 AND SCHEME OF 19TH SEPTEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12TH MARCH 1982, 10TH APRIL 1986, 30TH APRIL 1987 AND 12TH MARCH 1993, 12 MARCH 1994, 16 FEBRUARY 1996, 20 MARCH 1998 AND 9 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE BRITISH ARMY BY- (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN FORMER MEMBERS OF THE FORMER ARMY CATERING CORPS (THE FORMER CORPS) AND FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL LOGISTIC CORPS (THE CORPS) WHO ARE ENGAGED IN CATERING; (B) FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING FOR SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM; AND (C) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE CORPS BY PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS AND THOSE OF THE FORMER CORPS. (2) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION, FORMER MEMBERS OF THE FORMER CORPS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS BENEFICIARIES)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.