Financial history ALL SOULS MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATIONS

Charity number: 210009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.12k £4.63k £3.01k £6.57k £6.58k
Total expenditure £12.96k £2.32k £4.64k £8.64k £7.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A