Financial history ICAN CHARITY

Charity Number: 210031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.96m £8.68m £9.70m £10.88m £21.33m
Total expenditure £8.01m £8.52m £9.59m £11.62m £20.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £102.00k £238.00k £75.00k
Income from government grants £1.86m £1.97m £1.82m £310.00k £473.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.39m £2.28m £2.21m £2.44m £3.13m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.48m £6.31m £7.41m £1.23m £6.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £90.00k £84.00k £80.00k £87.00k £136.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.13m £11.33m
Income - Legacies £164.00k £151.00k £167.00k £55.00k £74.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.28m £8.09m £9.24m £11.21m £19.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £737.00k £439.00k £350.00k £403.00k £689.00k
Expenditure - Governance £120.00k £157.00k £197.00k £114.00k £136.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £399.00k £315.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0