CHRISTMAS LETTERS TO PRISONERS

Charity number: 210053
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide hand written letters at Christmas to prisoners and prison staff at the request of the chaplains of individual prisons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £10,975
Total expenditure: £28,848

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Belgium
  • Ireland
  • Kenya
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 16 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • C L P (Working name)
  • THE MISSION FOR CHRISTMAS LETTER TO PRISONERS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.32k £77.60k £12.89k £12.20k £10.98k
Total expenditure £21.55k £21.19k £24.55k £24.29k £28.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required