NATIONAL DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY NORFOLK REGION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norfolk Deaf Children's Society supports deaf children and their families throughout Norfolk. This is done primarily through regular newsletters, meetings, events, activities and trips, and through its equipment fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- NORFOLK DEAF CHILDRENS SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esme Hicks | Chair | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Salmon | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Parish | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Donna Duddington | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Clarke | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fawn Hindle | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Glanfield-Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cerian Hutchings | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Harrowven | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Soall | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Sutton | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.59k | £2.53k | £2.79k | £3.79k | £3.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.05k | £1.72k | £7.37k | £8.05k | £6.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION APPROVED AT AGM IN 1962 AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 20TH DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ACHIEVE FOR DEAF CHILDREN TE MAXIMUM BENEFIT AND HAPPINES FROM THEI HOME ENVIRONMENT, EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND THE CO-OPERATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norfolk Deaf Children's Society
The Deaf Centre
Johnson Place
Norwich
Norfolk
NR2 2SA
- Phone:
- 07808126826
- Email:
- norfolk@ndcsgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window