WYE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Housing for people in need with priority given to the elderly or a close connection to Wye.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 28 October 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH ELIZABETH JUDGE | Chair | 17 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Tiffeny Clare Findlay | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NICOLAS JOHN RUSSELL | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|||||
JULIE LOUISE DOD | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr TERENCE JOHN DONOVAN | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM CURTIS | Trustee | 02 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
LYNETTE SUSAN APPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.23k | £38.01k | £33.13k | £39.30k | £37.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.84k | £24.48k | £31.13k | £37.12k | £48.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28 OCTOBER 1977 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 24 FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
1 A YEARLY SUM OF ú2 TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN, WYE, WITH ST. MARY, BROOK FOR PREACHING TWO SERMONS. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WYE OR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. FOR FULL DETAILS, SEE SCHEMES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WYE OR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Oxenturn Road
Wye
ASHFORD
TN25 5AY
- Phone:
- 01233812370
- Email:
- WYEALMSHOUSE@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window