TIVERTON MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 210079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY DISTRIBUTES PAYMENTS TO SELECTED DESERVING INDIVIDUALS IN THE BOROUGH OF TIVERTON.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,423
Total expenditure: £3,366

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RUTH COTTIER Trustee
ROBERT CHILCOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
CUSTOM WOOD OR FUEL CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WAR MEMORIAL LIBRARY - TIVERTON
Received: On time
PETER DICKINSON Trustee
ROBERT CHILCOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
CUSTOM WOOD OR FUEL CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALISON WENDY MAUNDER Trustee
ROBERT CHILCOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
CUSTOM WOOD OR FUEL CHARITY
Received: On time
CECIL PHIPPEN Trustee
ROBERT CHILCOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
CUSTOM WOOD OR FUEL CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Beale Trustee
None on record
Mary Seaton Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.33k £3.33k £3.33k £1.74k £3.42k
Total expenditure £3.67k £3.67k £3.67k £3.37k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 May 2024 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEEDS OF LEASE AND RELEASE DATED 4 AND 5 SEPTEMBER 1747 AND RESOLUTION DATED 10 MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR AND INDIGENT INHABITANTS AS THE MAYOR AND BURGESSES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TIVERTON
Registration history
  • 28 October 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
6 ST PETER
TIVERTON
DEVON
EX16 6NX
Phone:
01884252827
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available