Financial history SOUTH CREAKE CHARITIES

Charity number: 210090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.23k £5.75k £7.15k £12.22k £7.48k
Total expenditure £2.62k £7.05k £7.52k £10.13k £5.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.05k N/A