Governing document THE SHEN PLACE ALMSHOUSES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JUNE 1911, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 JULY 1981, AND ORDER DATED 15 JULY 2003 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 MAY 2010. SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/06/2014 AND TRUST DEED OF AMENDMENT 29/07/2014
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (2) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 4 (POWER TO DISPOSE OF AND REPLACE PURPOSE PROPERTY), THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BRENTWOOD IN ESSEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.