APCAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual distributions made to the Catholicos Fund and to the Araratian Diocese in Armenia for the relief of widows and orphans. In addition, the trustees may use their discretion to provide occasional funding for other Armenian organisations that fall within its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Armenia
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- APEAR TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARMENAG ROBERT EDWARD TOPALIAN | Chair | 18 November 2005 |
|
|
||||
Vazgen Badalyan | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA NAYIRI LUCAS | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|||||
PAULA LILY MELVILLE | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SONIA VARTOUKIAN | Trustee | 23 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sarkis George Kurkjian FCSI | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr GAGIK STEPAN-SARKISSIAN BSC PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.21k | £10.16k | £9.79k | £10.17k | £9.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £24.33k | £19.88k | £18.77k | £17.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH OCT. 1927 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 5TH FEB, 1930, CERTIFICATE OF T'TEE INCORPORATION DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DISTRESSED ARMENIANS PREFERABLY WIDOWS & ORPHANS, (BOYS UNDER TWELVE YEARS AND GIRLS UNDER FIFTEEN YEARS OF AGE)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
Armenian Church Hall
Iverna Gardens
LONDON
W8 6TP
- Phone:
- 020 7937 0152
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window